+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 63
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 1
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee