+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 63
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 0
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee