+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 0
- Emergency clause carried
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee