+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/25
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 78 nays 14
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 0 4
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
- Reported back, do pass 13 1 0
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:15
- Reported back, do pass 6 0 0
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee