+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/25
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/25
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 5
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee