+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 79
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 28 nays 19
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:15
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee