+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/20
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee