+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 66
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee