+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/15
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 05/14
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 1
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Skarphol Dosch Williams
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Flakoll Holmberg Heckaman
- Refused to concur
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 4 1
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 66 nays 27
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 04:00
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:15
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Request return from committee
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee