+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/28
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 32
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 2 3
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee