+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 79
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:15
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee