+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/23
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 69 nays 21
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Schauer Karls Johnston
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Vedaa Elkin Marcellais
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reconsidered
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 64 nays 27
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Requested Senate to return
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 44 nays 46
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 19 2 0
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee