+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/14
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/14
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee