+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/20
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 22 0 1
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee