+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 75
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
On February 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
On January 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor