+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/07
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 05/03
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Weisz Anderson Muscha
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Anderson Larsen Axness
- Refused to concur
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 3
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 5 2
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee