+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Heinert Hoverson Hager
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Rust Fors Marcellais
- Refused to concur
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 4
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Education
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee