+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/11
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 7
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Request return from committee
- Rereferred to Education
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee