+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/25
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 0
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On January 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee