+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/16
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/15
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3
- Concurred
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee