+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 78
On March 10, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0
On March 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 7
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee