+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/07
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/06
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee