+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/30
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/29
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee