+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reconsidered
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 24 nays 20
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee