+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/17
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/17
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Klemin Magrum Hanson
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Anderson Clemens Piepkorn
- Refused to concur
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
- Request return from committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee