+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 02/26
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 02/26
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 22 0 1
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:50
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Political Subdivisions Committee