+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/07
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 05/03
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment failed
- Amendment proposed on floor
- Division B passed
- Division of bill
- Division A passed
- Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 0
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee