+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/26
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Pietsch Louser Kilichowski
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Uglem J. Lee Mathern
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 2
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On March 2, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 24, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor