+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
- Concurred
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 80 nays 11
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Agriculture
- Reconsidered
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 5
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee