+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/20
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/19
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee