+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/03
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/30
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency clause carried
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 13
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Tveit Skroch Rohr
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed K. Roers O. Larsen Hogan
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency clause carried
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 1
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:45
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee