+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 90
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee