+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/01
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
- Concurred
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 1
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 1
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsor
Industry, Business and Labor
Type:
Primary Sponsor