+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/30
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/29
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee