+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/17
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
- Concurred
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency clause carried
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 3
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 18 2 1
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsor
Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor