+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 0
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor