+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 8
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsor
Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor