+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/24
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 78 nays 12
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House recede)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House recede)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Vetter Hanson Paur
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Dwyer D. Larson Bakke
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 77 nays 12
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor