+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/25
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1
On March 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 17, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 2
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On January 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsor
Government and Veterans Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor