+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
- Concurred
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Laid over one legislative day
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 1
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee