+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/31
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsor
Industry, Business and Labor
Type:
Primary Sponsor