+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/14
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/14
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsor
Industry, Business and Labor
Type:
Primary Sponsor