+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 64
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 3, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsor
Industry, Business and Labor
Type:
Primary Sponsor