+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 1
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:45
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor