+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 56
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 7 2
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 33 nays 14
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Request return from committee
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
+ − Sponsor
Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor