+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/28
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor