+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/23
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 2
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsor
Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor