+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 0
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsor
Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor