+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/11
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/11
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsor
Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor