+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/07
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/06
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 0
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
+ − Sponsor
Agriculture
Type:
Primary Sponsor